TX HCR86 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating May as Fallen First Responder Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating May as Fallen First Responder Awareness Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Adopted RV#488 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAdopted
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAdopted
2017-04-27HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-31HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-02-24HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback