TX HCR84 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the vital importance of the enduring friendship between Texas and the United Kingdom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the vital importance of the enduring friendship between Texas and the United Kingdom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1208 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1208
2021-05-14HouseAdopted
2021-05-14HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-09HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2021-04-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback