TX HCR8 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating James Oran McCorquodale of Austin on his 90th birthday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating James Oran McCorquodale of Austin on his 90th birthday.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-19 Signed by the Governor
2013-07-31 Sent to the Governor
2013-07-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-07-30HouseSigned in the House
2013-07-30HouseReported enrolled
2013-07-30HouseSenate passage reported
2013-07-26SenateRead & adopted
2013-07-25SenateReceived from the House
2013-07-25HouseAdopted
2013-07-25HouseRules suspended
2013-07-10HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback