TX HCR78 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the 85th anniversary of the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 85th anniversary of the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-04-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-22HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-21HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-21HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-20SenateRead & adopted
2021-04-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09HouseAdopted
2021-04-09HouseLaid before the House
2021-04-09HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2021-04-01HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2021-03-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback