TX HCR61 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the Texas star mushroom as the official State Mushroom of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the Texas star mushroom as the official State Mushroom of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Adopted RV#943 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateAdopted
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#943
2021-05-11HouseAdopted
2021-05-11HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SCR38 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to Administration
SCR38 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Referred to Administration

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback