TX HCR61 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the Stop the Bleed campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the Stop the Bleed campaign.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAdopted
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-22SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-17SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-17SenateRead first time
2017-03-20SenateReceived from the House
2017-03-16HouseAdopted
2017-03-16HouseLaid before the House
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-03-07HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-02-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback