TX HCR61 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-23 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Title
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-23 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-23 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed |