TX HCR54 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Approving the SNAP settlement agreement between the U.S. Department of Justice and the Texas Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Approving the SNAP settlement agreement between the U.S. Department of Justice and the Texas Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1205 (Y: 110 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1205 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEPT. OF JUSTICE, U.S.
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy