TX HCR53 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring Lettie England of Odessa for her contributions to the community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Lettie England of Odessa for her contributions to the community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Signed by the Governor
2019-03-27 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-03-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-03-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-03-25HouseSenate passage reported
2019-03-25SenateRead & adopted
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-13HouseAdopted
2019-03-13HouseLaid before the House
2019-03-13HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback