TX HCR52 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Record vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - Adopted RV#1249 (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseRecord vote
2017-05-12HouseAdopted
2017-05-12HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-09HousePlaced on Resolutions Calendar
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07HouseReferred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
2017-01-30HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback