TX HCR50 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designating November as Texas Wildlife and Conservation Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating November as Texas Wildlife and Conservation Month for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Adopted RV#580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-11SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-11SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#580
2021-04-30HouseAdopted
2021-04-30HouseLaid before the House
2021-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback