TX HCR42 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February 26 as Bone Marrow, Blood, and Organ Donation Registry Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Title
Designating February 26 as Bone Marrow, Blood, and Organ Donation Registry Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] |
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - Adopted RV#118 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-01 | House | Record vote RV#118 |
2019-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONE MARROW, BLOOD, AND ORGAN DONATION REGISTRY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates