TX HCR42 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Welcoming the League City Chamber of Commerce and its legislative committee on their visit to the State Capitol.
Title
Welcoming the League City Chamber of Commerce and its legislative committee on their visit to the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-02-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-02-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-02-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-18 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-02-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-02-17 | Adopted | |
2009-02-17 | Read | |
2009-02-17 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Received from the House | |
2009-02-17 | Adopted | |
2009-02-17 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Subjects
LEAGUE CITY CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Welcoming
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Welcoming