TX HCR4 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law, under a federal mandate, that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of certain offenses.
Title
Expressing opposition to the enactment or enforcement in Texas of a law, under a federal mandate, that automatically suspends the driver's license of an individual who is convicted of certain offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-14 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SCR 1 |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2020-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR1 (Same As) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes--Drugs
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HCR4 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00004I.htm |