TX HCR32 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-09 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Summary
Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 11, 2009.
Title
Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 11, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2009-02-09 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Signed in the House | |
2009-02-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-04 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-02-03 | Record vote | |
2009-02-03 | Read & adopted | |
2009-02-03 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-02-03 | Received from the House | |
2009-02-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-02-03 | Record vote | |
2009-02-03 | Adopted | |
2009-02-03 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-03 | Filed |