TX HCR26 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Margana Wood on being crowned Miss Texas 2017.
Title
Congratulating Margana Wood on being crowned Miss Texas 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-08-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-08-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-08-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-08-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-08-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-07-28 | House | Filed |