TX HCR26 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the baseball team of Brazoswood High School in Clute on winning the 2011 UIL 5A state championship.
Title
Congratulating the baseball team of Brazoswood High School in Clute on winning the 2011 UIL 5A state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-06-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-06-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-06-27 | Read & adopted | |
2011-06-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-06-27 | Adopted | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-27 | Filed |