TX HCR24 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Joseph Patrick Cassidy of Panhandle.
Title
In memory of Joseph Patrick Cassidy of Panhandle.
Sponsors
Rep. Erwin Cain [R] | Rep. Warren Chisum [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Jim Landtroop [R] |
Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
Rep. John Smithee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-06-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-06-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-29 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-06-28 | Read & adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Received from the House | |
2011-06-28 | Adopted | |
2011-06-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-27 | Filed |