TX HCR22 | 2011 | 82nd Legislature 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the members of the Texas Supreme Court for their actions in support of legal aid services and honoring them for their work in promoting access to justice for the state's most vulnerable citizens.
Title
Commending the members of the Texas Supreme Court for their actions in support of legal aid services and honoring them for their work in promoting access to justice for the state's most vulnerable citizens.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Rep. Will Hartnett [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Rep. Jerry Madden [R] | Sen. Steve Ogden [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Sen. Earl Wentworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-06-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-06-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-06-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-06-27 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-06-27 | Adopted | |
2011-06-27 | Read | |
2011-06-27 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-06-27 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-06-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-06-27 | Adopted | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-24 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-06-21 | Filed |