TX HCR212 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. 2268.
Title
Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. 2268.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-27 - House - HCR 212Third Reading House (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-05-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
Resolutions
Resolutions--Corrective