TX HCR19 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Summary
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 27, 2009.
Title
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 27, 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duncan [R] | Rep. John Otto [R] | Rep. Mark Strama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-26 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2009-01-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-01-22 | Signed in the House | |
2009-01-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-01-15 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-01-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-01-14 | Read & adopted | |
2009-01-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-01-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-01-14 | Adopted | |
2009-01-14 | Laid before the House | |
2009-01-14 | Filed |