TX HCR187 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 4712.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructing the enrolling clerk of the house to make corrections in H.B. No. 4712.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - Adopted RV#1928 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateAdopted HB 4712
2019-05-26SenateRead
2019-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1928
2019-05-25HouseAdopted HB 4712
2019-05-25HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback