TX HCR18 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the delivery of the final C-130J Super Hercules to Dyess Air Force Base.
Title
Commemorating the delivery of the final C-130J Super Hercules to Dyess Air Force Base.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan King [R] | Sen. Troy Fraser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-07-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-07-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-07-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-07-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-07-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-07-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-07-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-15 | House | Filed |