TX HCR168 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission to conduct a study on control label products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission to conduct a study on control label products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Adopted RV#1606 (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-22HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1606
2019-05-22HouseAdopted
2019-05-22HouseLaid before the House
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-14HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-05-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback