TX HCR16 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kenneth and Susan Jastrow on their receipt of the Santa Rita Award by The University of Texas System Board of Regents.
Title
Congratulating Kenneth and Susan Jastrow on their receipt of the Santa Rita Award by The University of Texas System Board of Regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-10-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-10-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Adopted |
2021-10-18 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-10-18 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-10-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-10-16 | House | Filed |