TX HCR16 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-26 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-07-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BALANCED BUDGET
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HCR16 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HC00016I.htm |