TX HCR147 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to work collectively toward a fair, equitable, and logical approach to federal transportation funding in any new federal transportation legislation considered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to work collectively toward a fair, equitable, and logical approach to federal transportation funding in any new federal transportation legislation considered.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HousePosting rule suspended
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-04-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback