TX HCR141 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State Insurance Building in the Capitol Complex in honor of former president George H. W. Bush.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to rename the State Insurance Building in the Capitol Complex in honor of former president George H. W. Bush.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Adopted RV#492 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-08SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-08HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-05HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-04HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateAdopted
2017-05-04SenateRead
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenateRules suspended
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAdopted
2017-04-27HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15HouseReferred to House Administration
2017-03-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback