TX HCR139 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Captain Carl H. Isett on the event of his retirement from the United States Navy Reserve.
Title
Honoring Captain Carl H. Isett on the event of his retirement from the United States Navy Reserve.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Dustin Burrows [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-05-23 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed |