TX HCR129 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Expressing support for the creation of the Sam Houston Republic of Texas Presidential Library at Sam Houston State University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the creation of the Sam Houston Republic of Texas Presidential Library at Sam Houston State University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Adopted RV#1351 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateAdopted
2017-05-28SenateRead
2017-05-28SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-28SenateRules suspended
2017-05-28SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseAdopted
2017-05-19HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-12HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-05-12HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-04-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback