TX HCR11 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating former state representative Carl H. Isett on his promotion to the rank of captain in the U.S. Navy Reserve.
Title
Congratulating former state representative Carl H. Isett on his promotion to the rank of captain in the U.S. Navy Reserve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-07-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-07-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-07-18 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-07-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-07-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-07-11 | House | Adopted |
2013-07-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-11 | House | Filed |