TX HCR100 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Filed without the Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating Texas Impact on its 50th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating Texas Impact on its 50th anniversary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28 Filed without the Governor's signature
2023-04-17 Sent to the Governor
2023-04-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-04-14HouseSigned in the House
2023-04-13HouseReported enrolled
2023-04-13HouseSenate passage reported
2023-04-12SenateRead & adopted
2023-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2023-04-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-04-11HouseAdopted
2023-04-11HouseRules suspended
2023-04-05HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback