TX HCR10 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of former state representative Roberto Gutierrez of McAllen.
Title
In memory of former state representative Roberto Gutierrez of McAllen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-10-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-10-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-10-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-10-06 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-09-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-09-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-09-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-09-27 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-09-24 | House | Filed |