TX HCR1 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting prayers, including the use of the word "God," at public gatherings and displays of the Ten Commandments in public educational institutions and other government buildings.
Title
Supporting prayers, including the use of the word "God," at public gatherings and displays of the Ten Commandments in public educational institutions and other government buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1203 (Y: 103 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - Adopted RV#1203 (Y: 103 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1203 |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed |