TX HB999 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain high school students.
Title
Relating to the use of individual graduation committees for certain high school students.
Sponsors
Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Rep. Jared Patterson [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1626 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#383 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#383 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-31 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2021-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1626 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#383 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended 1-Bernal |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2058 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Co-author authorized
SB2058 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Co-author authorized
SB2058 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Co-author authorized