TX HB996 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the collection of consumer debt by debt buyers.
Title
Relating to the collection of consumer debt by debt buyers.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] |
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1786 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#309 (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#309 (Y: 120 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1786 |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#309 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended 1-Collier |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |