TX HB993 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice to a prospective residential tenant regarding flooding and flood insurance.
Title
Relating to notice to a prospective residential tenant regarding flooding and flood insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Amended RV#1148 (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1148 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended 1-Coleman |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Farrar |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed |