TX HB989 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Livestock Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to industrial hemp; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to industrial hemp; requiring an occupational license; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB116 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback