TX HB98 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a school district assigning a mentor teacher to a new classroom teacher.
Title
Relating to a school district assigning a mentor teacher to a new classroom teacher.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-08-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-08-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-08-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-08-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-07-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=HB98 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/HB00098I.htm |