TX HB974 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public school safety measures and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public school safety measures and procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Education
2019-05-08SenateRead first time
2019-05-07SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1049
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmendment as amended withdrawn 5-Toth
2019-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-06HouseAmendment amended 6-Toth
2019-05-06HouseAmendment(s) offered 5-Toth
2019-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Schaefer
2019-05-06HouseAmended 3-Metcalf
2019-05-06HouseAmended 2-Metcalf
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Metcalf
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback