TX HB97 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to Property Tax
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to Property Tax
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of land for appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of land for appraisal for ad valorem tax purposes as qualified open-space land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Amended RV#846 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | House | Record vote RV#846 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-30 | House | Amended 1-Springer |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
OPEN-SPACE LAND
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions