TX HB965 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to updating references to certain former health services state agencies and certain terms used to describe persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities in the Education Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to updating references to certain former health services state agencies and certain terms used to describe persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities in the Education Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1856 (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1856
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-03-22HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB896 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback