TX HB961 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the membership and training course requirements of a public school concussion oversight team and the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the membership and training course requirements of a public school concussion oversight team and the removal of a public school student from an interscholastic athletic activity on the basis of a suspected concussion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#395 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#395
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-15HouseAmended 1-Howard
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback