TX HB948 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the period for which certain land owned by a religious organization for the purpose of expanding a place of religious worship or constructing a new place of religious worship may be exempted from ad valorem taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the period for which certain land owned by a religious organization for the purpose of expanding a place of religious worship or constructing a new place of religious worship may be exempted from ad valorem taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback