TX HB946 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to vehicles exempt from vehicle safety inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vehicles exempt from vehicle safety inspections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-08HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Transportation
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback