TX HB940 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the consequences of successfully completing a period of deferred adjudication community supervision.
Title
Relating to the consequences of successfully completing a period of deferred adjudication community supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-30 | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION