TX HB935 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to emergency medical air transportation funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency medical air transportation funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#770 (Y: 137 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#701 (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback