TX HB935 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Willow Point Municipal Utility District of Fort Bend and Waller Counties; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Willow Point Municipal Utility District of Fort Bend and Waller Counties; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Roads
FORT BEND COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WALLER COUNTY
WILLOW POINT MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
County Government--Roads
FORT BEND COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WALLER COUNTY
WILLOW POINT MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB935 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB00935I.htm |