TX HB931 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that contract with political subdivisions for certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that contract with political subdivisions for certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#2051 (Y: 83 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Motion fails RV#1847 (Y: 63 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1169 (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1140 (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-28SenateHouse discharges conferees-reported
2017-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-28HouseHouse discharges conferees
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-25HouseHouse requests conference committee
2017-05-25HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2017-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-25HouseRecord vote
2017-05-25HouseMotion fails
2017-05-25HouseMotion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenatePassed
2017-05-23SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-23SenateRecord vote
2017-05-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23SenateAmended
2017-05-23SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-11HouseRecord vote
2017-05-11HousePassed
2017-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10HouseRecord vote
2017-05-10HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-10HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB931
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00931I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00931H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00931E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00931S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00931F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB931&RcdVtNo=1140&Ch=H&Dt=05/10/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB931&RcdVtNo=1169&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB931&RcdVtNo=1847&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=77
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB931&RcdVtNo=2051&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017

Bill Comments

feedback