TX HB929 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.
Title
Relating to the duties of a magistrate to inform an arrested person of consequences of a plea of guilty or nolo contendere.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#324 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#324 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#324 |
2019-04-12 | House | Passed |
2019-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |